Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Proton Therapy Treatment Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Morales, Mosby, and Platt
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide, subject to certain conditions, proton therapy treatment services to Program recipients diagnosed with cancer.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Proton Therapy Treatment Services
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM