Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm Animals
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Krebs, Sample-Hughes, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing specified exceptions to a specified prohibition on the practice of veterinary medicine and dispensing specified medication that is not in a specified manufacturer's container for a person who sells or dispenses specified medication in a container with a label showing specified information for use by a specified nonfarm animal and for a licensed veterinarian who dispenses specified compounded preparations to be used for a specified nonfarm animal under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0614
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {456586/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations 28
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {456586/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-301, 2-313 )
(   12-101, 12-102, 12-403, 12-510, 12-6C-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM