Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Genetically Modified Organisms in Food - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to conduct a study of whether genetically modified organisms in food have an adverse effect on human health; requiring the study to include a review of academic literature and scientific studies; and requiring the Department to report its findings to the General Assembly on or before May 1, 2014.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM