Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure of Directory Information and Medical Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Kelly, West, and Morales
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a health care provider may disclose a medical record developed primarily in connection with mental health services; authorizing a health care provider to disclose directory information about a patient to a specified individual except under specified circumstances; requiring a health care provider to inform a patient of health care information that the health care provider may include in a specified directory and the persons to whom the information may be disclosed; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0584
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296885/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medical Records - Disclosure of Directory Information and Medical Records - Mental Health Services
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {296885/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Medical Records - Disclosure of Directory Information and Medical Records
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {637672/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Medical Records - Disclosure of Directory Information and Medical Records
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Text - Chapter - Medical Records - Disclosure of Directory Information and Medical Records
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-301, 4-302, 4-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM