Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer Billing
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public service company from terminating water or sewer service to a multifamily dwelling unit in Baltimore City based on the nonpayment of charges; requiring a landlord who collects certain fees or charges in Baltimore City to provide certain billing data to the tenant or provide certain authorization that allows the tenant to directly access certain billing data; authorizing a landlord in Baltimore City to collect certain fees and charges under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer Billing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer Billing
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-119, 8-208, 8-401, 8-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM