Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Vaughn, Adams, Branch, Brooks, Glenn, Mautz, W. Miller, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Plumbing to adopt the National Standard Plumbing Code as the State Plumbing Code; providing that the Board may adopt specified standards of a specified nationally recognized testing organization; requiring a county or municipality to enforce the State Plumbing Code and authorizing a county or municipality to adopt and enforce amendments to the State Plumbing Code that meet specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-205, 12-206, 12-502, 12-605, 12-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM