Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Morhaim, Luedtke, Mizeur, S. Robinson, and Dwyer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Agriculture, in consultation with federal and State agencies and the University of Maryland, College Park, to study the feasibility of growing industrial hemp in the State and the availability of markets relating to industrial hemp and hemp products; requiring the Secretary to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014, addressing strategies for safe cultivation and use of industrial hemp, the status of hemp programs in other states, and specified recommendations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {330712/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-9)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable with Amendments {330712/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (123-9) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 4/03/2014 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM