Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and Taxation
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan and Busch
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a municipality to establish and maintain a registry of vacant and blighted buildings and a special remediation fund to administer registration, inspection, and remediation programs for vacant and blighted buildings; authorizing a municipality to establish a specified class of real property and set a special tax rate for that class of property; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing cancelled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/07/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-219, 6-101, 6-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM