Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Wireless Communication Devices - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Holmes, and Jalisi
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that applies a specified prohibition involving the use of a wireless communication device to drivers of Class H (school) vehicles only if the motor vehicle is in motion; and providing that prohibitions against the use of a wireless communication device by a driver of a Class H (school) vehicle or a minor while operating a motor vehicle apply only if the motor vehicle is in the travel portion of the roadway.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Wireless Communication Devices - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Wireless Communication Devices - Prohibited Acts
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1124, 21-1124.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM