Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - Waiver
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before October 1, 2018, to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a waiver under a certain provision of federal law to implement a certain demonstration project establishing work or community engagement requirements on certain enrollees in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; requiring a certain application to include certain information; and requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0886
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - Waiver
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM