Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Anderton, Cassilly, Flanagan, Folden, Glass, Hornberger, Kittleman, Lisanti, McComas, Otto, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, rather than requiring, the Department of Natural Resources to revoke the authorization to catch oysters of a person who the Department finds or concludes has knowingly committed one of specified offenses; and authorizing a person whose authorization to catch oysters is revoked under specified provisions of law to apply for reinstatement of the authorization after 2 years; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1210, 4-1211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM