Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Mental Health Facilities - Accreditation
Sponsored by
Delegate Hubbard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene consider accreditation of specified mental health facilities by specified accrediting organizations; and authorizing the Secretary to consider accreditation of specified mental health facilities by an accrediting organization approved by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM