Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Art Establishment License
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing a special art establishment license in St. Mary's County; specifying that the license may be used by a business in Leonardtown engaged in specified activities; prohibiting the issuance of the license to a specified type of business; authorizing a license holder to sell or serve beer and wine at retail for consumption on the premises under specified circumstances; providing for an annual license fee; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM