Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing the Public Service Commission to authorize the use of a master meter in a residential multiple occupancy building for certain purposes under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to conduct a certain study on the feasibility of transitioning master meters installed and used for gas or electric to energy allocation systems or submeters in apartment buildings or complexes, condominiums, and housing cooperatives; providing for the required elements of the study; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Utility Submetering - Multiple Occupancy Buildings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903499/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Utility Submetering - Multiple Occupancy Buildings
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments {903499/1 Adopted 42
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {827272/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301, 7-304.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM