Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegate Carter
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations about any changes that may be made to the procurement process for law enforcement communications technology that may lead to cost savings for the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1246 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM