Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties
Sponsored by
Delegates Norman, Wilson, Cardin, James, K. Kelly, Lafferty, Smigiel, F. Turner, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exemption for specialties taken for use of the State from a specified statute of limitations period; altering the time period, to 12 years, within which a civil action on specialties taken for use by the State shall be filed; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM