Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Beitzel, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, McKay, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to create a framework for dual language immersion programs in the State, recommend strategies to increase the number of dual language programs in the State, and identify potential funding sources; requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations to the Governor, the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee, and the House Appropriations Committee on or before specified dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM