Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Congressional Representatives - Residence Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Arentz, Beitzel, Chisholm, Clark, Corderman, Cox, M. Fisher, Malone, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Morgan, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, beginning November 1, 2022, a candidate for Representative in Congress who is elected must, beginning on the date of the candidate's election, be a resident of the congressional district that the candidate has been elected to represent.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Congressional Representatives - Residence Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Congressional Representatives - Residence Requirement
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:37 PM