Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Control of Baltimore City Police Department
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that the Police Department of Baltimore City is an agency and instrumentality of the City of Baltimore, instead of the State; and providing that police officers of the department have the authority conferred under a specified provision of law.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Control of Baltimore City Police Department
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Control of Baltimore City Police Department
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-2, 16-3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM