Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Merging the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration and the Mental Hygiene Administration in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish the Behavioral Health Administration in the Department; establishing the responsibilities, powers, and duties of the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration; requiring substance use disorder programs and mental health programs to be licensed by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, with specified exceptions; repealing a specified prohibition; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216584/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {177574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {216584/2 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {177574/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-502 )
(   21-305, 2-303, 8-412 )
(   10-101, 10-201 through 10-204, 10-901, 19-2301, 2-106, 2-501, 2-601, 4-307, 5-703, 5-803, 5-804, 5-805, 5-808, 7.5-101 through 7.5-204, 7-403, 7-802, 8-101, 8-201 through 8-204, 8-402, 8-403, 8-404, 8-405, 8-503, 8-702 )
(   20-101, 20-202 )
(   5-314, 8-406 )
(   9-2802, 9-2806 )
(   16-212, 16-212.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM