Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Background Check Program in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; providing for the purpose of the Program; requiring an adult dependent care provider to obtain a specified fitness determination from the Program for specified employees; requiring an adult dependent care provider to require specified applicants to submit specified documentation and to submit to a preliminary screening and a State and national criminal history records check to obtain a specified fitness determination; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1901 through 19-1912 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM