Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Caroline County - Deer Management Permit - Firearms
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Adams, Arentz, and Jacobs
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual who holds a Deer Management Permit in Caroline County to use a shotgun or breech loading center fired rifle approved by the Department of Natural Resources to hunt deer throughout the year for the purpose of preventing damage to crops; and authorizing the Department to authorize an individual to hunt deer on Sundays in Caroline County under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM