Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring Morgan State University to convene a task force to foster reconciliation and achieve racial equity by taking specified actions; requiring the task force to include specified members and consult with specified units of State government; requiring the task force to hold hearings at locations throughout the State and invite persons to testify, to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters, and to monitor and evaluate the implementation of specified recommendations using specified criteria; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0471
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM