Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan and McCray
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing provisions of law governing the rental of personal motor vehicles to other persons in a specified manner; establishing that specified persons may rent only specified classes of personal motor vehicles to other persons; prohibiting a renter of a personal motor vehicle from using the motor vehicle for specified purposes; prohibiting a person from renting a personal motor vehicle to another person unless the motor vehicle is covered by specified security; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1056
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301 )
(   18-101.1, 18-201 through 18-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM