Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Malone, McComas, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption under the sales and use tax for the sale of a Bluetooth headset or a consumer electronic device designed to aid in hands-free device use while driving under certain circumstances; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1242 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-234 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM