Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Computer Health and Safety Guidelines and Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz and Angel
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to support and facilitate education in computer health and safety guidelines and procedures, develop a process to monitor specified implementation of specified education, and submit a specified summary to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; and requiring the State Board of Education to encourage county boards of education to incorporate specified lessons into specified curricula.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1150
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-111.3, 7-411.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM