Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Lake Arbor Center Water and Sewage Connection Project
Sponsored by
Delegates Swain, Howard, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $450,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Lake Arbor Foundation, Inc. for the planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, and reconstruction of the Lake Arbor Center Water and Sewage Connection Project, including connecting the community clubhouse to public water and sewage, located in Mitchellville; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1044
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2014 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 101). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 101 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Swain) Adopted (134-3)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Swain) Adopted (134-3) 42
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 42
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM