Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Commission on Efficiency in State Government - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Beitzel, McConkey, McMillan, and Schuh
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Efficiency in State Government; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the efficiency of units of State government; requiring a unit to provide the Commission with any information the Commission requires to carry out its duties; requiring, under specified circumstances, the General Assembly to reduce the amount included in specified budget bills for specified units by a specified amount; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-3101 through 9-3108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM