Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh and Niemann
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law providing that the establishment of a lien is the remedy for nonpayment of a ground rent on specified residential property; altering the application of provisions of law requiring a landlord of a ground lease to give notice to specified persons when the ground rent is in arrears; authorizing the holder of a ground rent in arrears to be reimbursed for specified expenses under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1095
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/04/2014 Text - First - Real Property - Ground Rents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-108.1, 14-116.1, 14-117, 8-111.1, 8-111.2, 8-402.2, 8-402.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM