Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Unpaid Charges
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission to establish specified procedures by which an owner of residential property, that is also the primary residence of the owner, may apply for a waiver or an extension of time to pay specified charges, including a method by which the owner may appeal a specified decision of the Commission to the Board of County Commissioners or an entity designated by the Board of County Commissioners; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {230211/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {230211/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/17/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   113-12, 113-14, 113-29 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM