Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Water Heating Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Barnes, Cardin, Conway, DeBoy, Gaines, Jameson, Kipke, Myers, Pena-Melnyk, Schuh, and Stukes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "solar water heating system" for purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard to include systems that consist of specified concentrating solar thermal collectors under specified circumstances; and making a stylistic change.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1064
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Frush) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Frush) Adopted (134-0) 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 45
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM