Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lean Government Advisory Board - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Lean Government Advisory Board; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Board; requiring the Board to meet at least quarterly and to apply lean principles to analyze the operations and organization of State government, identify specified inefficiencies, and recommend specified improvements; requiring the Board, beginning December 1, 2017, to annually report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-3201 through 9-3204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM