Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund to assist the Department of Housing and Community Development, in conjunction with the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City, in expeditiously removing blighted property within Baltimore City; requiring the Secretary to administer the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; authorizing the Governor to include an appropriation of $30,000,000 in the annual budget bill for the Fund for fiscal year 2020 and $25,000,000 for the Fund in fiscal years 2021 through 2024; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1084
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214761/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {214761/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {414032/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM