Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Adams, Arentz, Fisher, Folden, S. Howard, Impallaria, and McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring local governments to fully comply with and support federal immigration law; prohibiting local governments from restricting certain individuals from requesting, obtaining, sending, receiving, or maintaining certain immigration information; requiring local governments to implement certain requirements and obligations in a manner that is consistent with federal immigration law and protects civil rights; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Appropriations
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0598 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Text - First - Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-520, 4-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM