Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salaries
Sponsored by
Wicomico County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the salary of each judge of the Orphans' Court for Wicomico County from $6,400 to $9,500; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of a judge of the Orphans' Court for Wicomico County while serving in a term of office beginning before October 1, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Cane) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Cane) Adopted (131-3)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Cane) Adopted (134-0) 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Cane) Adopted (131-3) 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Referred Judiciary 45
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM