Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Vogt, Buckel, Chang, Ciliberti, Folden, Krimm, Reznik, and K. Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company" to extend a specified period of time from a specified date that an active business may claim the biotechnology tax credit; and applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1107
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-725 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM