Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data Collection
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Howard and Angel
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a video lottery operation licensee in Prince George's County, on or before February 1, 2018 and each February 1 thereafter, to compile data on the age, sex, race, and county of residence of video lottery employees who worked in the previous year and to submit the data to the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission within 3 months after receiving the data; and requiring the Commission to submit a report each year containing the data to the General Assembly and specified other persons.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-01, 9-1A-23 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM