Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (140-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "psychiatric nurse practitioner" for purposes of specified provisions of law relating to the voluntary and involuntary admissions of individuals to specified facilities for the treatment of mental disorders; prohibiting a certificate signed by a psychiatric nurse practitioner for the involuntary admission of an individual to specified facilities for the treatment of a mental disorder from being used for an admission under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1081
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-1)
Proceedings
72
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 71
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-1) 72
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-616, 10-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM