Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Surrender of Firearms
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Angel, Atterbeary, Carr, Chang, Gaines, Gibson, Haynes, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, Lierman, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Sanchez, Valentino-Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a temporary peace order and a final peace order to order the respondent to surrender to law enforcement authorities any firearm in the respondent's possession within a certain time frame and to refrain from possession of any firearm for the duration of the temporary peace order or the final peace order; requiring, instead of authorizing, a temporary protective order to order a certain respondent to surrender to law enforcement authorities any firearm in the respondent's possession within a certain time frame; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Surrender of Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Surrender of Firearms
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-505, 4-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM