Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Ciliberti, J. Lewis, McComas, Shoemaker, Vogt, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain individuals a credit against the State income tax for the cost of certain veterinary services for certain adopted government service dogs; providing that the credit may not exceed the lesser of $1,000 or the State income tax imposed for the taxable year; providing that the credit may not be carried over to another taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1243 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM