Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Davis, Fisher, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Lisanti, Mautz, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certain process for valuing a water company or a sewage disposal company that is the subject of a certain acquisition; prohibiting a person from acquiring a controlling interest in certain water services or sewage disposal providers without prior approval of the Public Service Commission; providing the Commission may authorize a certain acquisition if the Commission finds that it is consistent with the public convenience and necessity; establishing a process to determine the fair market value of the selling utility; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0854
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203494/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {203494/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 4-206, 6-301 through 6-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM