Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision Program - Study PG 304-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Police Department to conduct a study on the feasibility of establishing a Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision program in each county precinct; requiring the study to consider specified criteria; and requiring the Department to report to the Prince George's County delegation to the General Assembly on specified findings of the study on or before December 15, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County - Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision Program - Study PG 304-17
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM