Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Anderson, Anderton, Barve, Beitzel, Cassilly, Folden, Ghrist, Impallaria, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Mautz, Reilly, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Office of Legislative Audits to perform an audit of local governments that receive a distribution of highway user revenues; increasing, over 7 fiscal years, the portion of highway user revenues that is distributed to local governments; altering the allocation of the local share of highway user revenues among Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; requiring, if distributions to municipalities do not equal $26,400,000, that additional distributions of highway user revenues be made to municipalities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0901
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland Act
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1220, 2-1223 )
(   1-101, 8-402, 8-403, 8-412 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM