Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Flanagan, Lam, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to establish a Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee to study the feasibility of creating a health record and payment integration program, approaches for accelerating the adjudication of clean claims, and certain other issues; requiring the Commission to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2019, a report outlining the findings and recommendations of the Advisory Committee; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {506185/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Health Record and Payment Clearinghouse Pilot Program
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {506185/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM