Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert – Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Anderson, Angel, J. Lewis, Moon, and Sanchez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a health care provider who attests in a certificate of a qualified expert or who testifies in relation to a proceeding before an arbitration panel or a court concerning compliance with or departure from standards of care may not have devoted more than 20% of the provider's professional activities to activities that directly involve testimony in personal injury claims during the 12 months immediately preceding a certain date; and applying the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0030
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {352212/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-54)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {352212/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert – Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (84-54) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Referred Rules 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page