Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Rosenberg, Morgan, McDonough, Kelly, Saab, Miele, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Hayes, Szeliga, Kipke, Sample-Hughes, K. Young, Barron, Metzgar, West, Hill, Cullison, Platt, and Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a State Medical Director for Children Receiving Child Welfare Services in the Department of Human Services; requiring the Director and all personnel under the direct supervision of the Director to have access to all confidential information and records available to, or in the possession of, local departments, subject to a certain condition; requiring the State Medical Director to establish a Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program for children in out-of-home placements; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {474168/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {407977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Services - Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {474168/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {407977/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Text - Chapter - Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1101 through 8-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM