Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland - Closed Sessions
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell (By Request)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to meet in closed session or adjourn an open session to a closed session to discuss specified matters; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/23/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-206, 3-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page