Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Qualifying Patients – Identification Cards and Motor Vehicle Administration Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Corderman, McKay, Malone, Parrott, Reilly, and Rey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain qualifying patients to carry the identification card issued by the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission when in public and surrender the identification card to a uniformed law enforcement officer who demands the card or to elect to include in a certain record kept by the Motor Vehicle Administration information that the patient has an identification card and inform any uniformed law enforcement officer who demands the card of certain information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Qualifying Patients – Identification Cards and Motor Vehicle Administration Records
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM