Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Solar Facilities - Vicinity Tariff
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Ghrist, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to make available to certain retail electric customers a 30% discount on a certain rate based on the location of a customer meter within one-half mile of a commercial solar facility; requiring the discount to be included in a certain tariff; requiring the discount to be offered on an opt-in basis; requiring the electric company to provide notice of the discount to certain customers each year in a certain manner; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Solar Facilities - Vicinity Tariff
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Solar Facilities - Vicinity Tariff
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 4-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM