Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to establish the South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority; requiring the ordinance establishing the South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority to address specified matters; requiring, starting in fiscal year 2018, at least 50% of local impact grants from video lottery proceeds to be distributed to the Authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1164
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565169/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {565169/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM